VA HB637 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Bristol. Dissolves the economic development committee of Bristol, Virginia. The Industrial Development Authority of the City of Bristol, Virginia (the City), shall have all the powers to induce manufacturing, industrial, and commercial enterprises to locate or remain in the City as authorized by the Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act and shall specifically have all powers vested in the former economic development committee of the City.
Title
Bristol, City of; amending charter, dissolves economic development committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 320 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB637ER) |
2018-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-19 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102319D |