VA HB639 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; notice of assessment changes. Provides that in certain localities, in the event that the total assessed value of real property would result in an increase of one percent or more in the total real property tax levied, the notice of assessment changes shall state the tax rate that would levy the same amount of real estate tax as the previous year when multiplied by the new total assessed value of real estate.
Title
Real property tax; notice of rate and assessment changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142) | |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 142 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB639ER) |
2024-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB639H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24105997D-H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105997D-H1 |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105025D |
Same As/Similar To
SB677 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)