VA HB646 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permit applications for outdoor advertising. Defines "billboard sign" and does away with the Certification Acceptance Program, which allowed an entity with five or more signs to self-inspect and certify its compliance with the regulations in lieu of paying a permit fee. The bill also raises application fees for permits for advertising.
Title
Outdoor advertising; permit application fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145) | |
2012-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 145 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB646ER) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-07 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102064D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1 | 351 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 361 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 362 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |