VA HB655 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special exception for solar photovoltaic projects. Authorizes a locality to include reasonable regulations and provisions in its zoning ordinance for a special exception for any solar photovoltaic (electric energy) project. The bill authorizes the governing body of such locality to grant a condition that includes (i) dedication of real property of substantial value or (ii) substantial cash payments for or construction of substantial public improvements, the need for which is not generated solely by the granting of a conditional use permit, so long as such proffered conditions are reasonably related to the project.
Title
Solar photovoltaic projects; special exceptions for any project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385) | |
2020-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 385 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB655ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108318D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB655S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108318D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108318D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB655H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107158D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107158D-H1 |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102659D |
Same As/Similar To
SB870 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)