VA HB683 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of zoning appeals; appeal to general district court. Provides that in the case of an appeal from the board of zoning appeals of an order, requirement, decision, or determination of a zoning administrator, a person aggrieved by any such order, requirement, decision, or determination may file the petition with the clerk of the general district court that shall have jurisdiction to hear such appeal.
Title
Zoning appeals, board of; appeal to general district court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102602D |