VA HB706 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Offshore oil and gas drilling; prohibition on leases; policy. Prohibits the granting of a lease, easement, or permit on the beds of the coastal waters of the Commonwealth that would allow any infrastructure for conveying to shore oil or gas produced from offshore drilling in the Outer Continental Shelf Planning Area and removes any oil or gas lease granted on such beds from the mandate that such lease include a royalty payment requirement. The bill removes policy statements supporting federal efforts to permit oil and gas development 50 miles or more off the Atlantic shoreline.
Title
Offshore drilling; prohibition on leases, policy.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (60-Y 37-N) (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 451 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB706ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (60-Y 37-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (60-Y 37-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB706H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107040D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107040D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporates HB1016 (Guy) |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103786D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1016 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
SB795 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)
SB795 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)