VA HB715 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governing boards of public institutions of higher education; increases in undergraduate tuition or mandatory fees; notice. Prohibits the governing board of any public institution of higher education from approving an increase in undergraduate tuition or mandatory fees without providing students and the public notice of the date, time, and location of the meeting at which public comment on such planned increase is permitted on the institution's website and through any other standard means of communication utilized by the institution with students at least 10 days prior to such meeting.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; increases in undergraduate tuition.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 435 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB715ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hashmi agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment #2 rejected |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment reconsidered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment #1 agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20104092D-E |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB715E |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104092D |