VA HB716 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Trafficking in persons; penalties. Creates new felonies for trafficking in persons for forced labor or sexual servitude and adds the new felonies as a predicate criminal act under the criminal gang statute, as racketeering crimes, and to the functions of a multijurisdiction grand jury, and also allows seizure and forfeiture of property used in committing such felonies. The new felonies and the existing felony of receiving money for procuring a person are added to the rape shield statute. The bill also makes sexual servitude an affirmative defense to the crime of prostitution and allows a petition for a child in need of services to be substituted for a delinquency petition for certain minors arrested for prostitution, disallows the release of certain victim information, specifies law-enforcement protocol for victims who may not be legally present, requires persons convicted of the new felonies to pay restitution that compensates for the victim's labor, and creates a civil action for trafficked persons. The Secretary of Public Safety is required to convene an anti-trafficking committee and the Virginia Prevention of Human Trafficking Victim Fund is created, which will be administered by the Department of Criminal Justice Services.
Title
Trafficking in persons; penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102656D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 50.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 224.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 42.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 116.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB716 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB716+hil |