VA HB719 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special hunting and fishing license for disabled veterans. Allows a veteran who is permanently disabled due to a service-connected disability to obtain at no cost a combined hunting and freshwater fishing lifetime license, or a separate hunting or freshwater fishing lifetime license.
Title
Hunting and fishing license, special; permanently disabled veteran to apply and receive at no cost.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380) | |
2012-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 380 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB719ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-06 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-01 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103431D |
Same As/Similar To
SB528 (Same As) 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Subjects
Armed Forces
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Hunting Laws and Permits
Persons with Disabilities
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Hunting Laws and Permits
Persons with Disabilities