VA HB725 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (12-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (12-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation Commission; membership. Allows the governing body of each participating county and city in the Northern Virginia Transportation Commission (NVTC) to appoint commissioners to the NVTC who are not members of the governing body.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Commission; membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (12-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101103D-E |
2016-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB725E |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101103D |