VA HB725 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; Virginia Public Procurement Act; definition of small business. Changes the requirements of the definition of small business for the purposes of programs of the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity and the Virginia Public Procurement Act to require the business, together with affiliates, to have 250 or fewer employees and average annual gross receipts of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years. Currently for these programs, a business is required to meet one or the other of these conditions to be considered a small business.
Title
Small businesses; change in definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103375D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |