VA HB725 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Teachers in certain schools for students with disabilities; provisional licenses; extension. Requires the Board of Education to extend for at least one additional year, but for no more than two additional years, the three-year provisional license of a teacher employed in a school for students with disabilities that is licensed by the Board upon receiving from the school administrator of such school (i) a recommendation for such extension and (ii) satisfactory performance evaluations for such teacher for each year of the original three-year provisional license. The provisions of the bill mirror current law relating to the extension of provisional licenses for public school teachers.
Title
Teachers in certain schools for students with disabilities; extension of provisional licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporated by Education |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1469-Gooditis) by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104011D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1469 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0639)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB725 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB725+hil |