VA HB727 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; emergency regulations for economic development projects. Provides that an agency may receive a waiver, defined in the bill as the approval for the promulgation of emergency regulations or suspension of current regulations, for the creation of qualifying economic development projects, also defined in the bill, upon consultation with and receipt of the approval of the Virginia Economic Development Partnership and Virginia Innovation Partnership Authority and the approval of the Governor that such regulations are necessary for the achievement of such qualifying economic development project. The bill exempts from such waiver the promulgation of regulations pursuant to the Virginia Occupational Safety and Health Program of the Virginia Department of Labor and Industry and by the Department of Environmental Quality.
Title
Administrative Process Act; emergency regulations for economic development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24105042D |