VA HB756 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bail for a person accused of a crime that is an act of violence; notice to attorney for the Commonwealth. Requires a magistrate to transmit within 24 hours a copy of the checklist for bail determination form to the attorney for the Commonwealth when a magistrate conducts a bail hearing for a person arrested on a warrant or capias for an act of violence. The bill also provides that transmission of such copy to the attorney for the Commonwealth may be by facsimile or other electronic means.
Title
Bail for a person accused of a crime that is an act of violence; notice to attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 47 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB756ER) |
2022-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House Block Vote (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102432D-E |
2022-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB756E |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102432D |
Same As/Similar To
SB614 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
SB614 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
SB614 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)