VA HB771 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Asset forfeiture. Prohibits a law-enforcement agency from requesting, requiring, or otherwise inducing a person who asserts a lawful right to property seized for the purpose of forfeiture to waive his interest in or rights to the property until an information is filed. The bill allows attorneys for the Commonwealth to electronically notify the Department of Motor Vehicles, in a manner approved by the Commissioner, that a vehicle has been seized. A provision is added allowing a forfeiture proceeding to be stayed if it is also related to a warrant. The Department of Criminal Justice Services will be required to prepare an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly regarding information on all drug and nondrug asset seizures and forfeitures. The report shall be available to the public. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Asset forfeiture; seizure of property, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 203 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB771ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102895D |
Same As/Similar To
SB423 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0423)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 386.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |