VA HB773 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Analogous DUI laws of any other state or of the United States. Allows analogous state laws to be used as prior DUI convictions. A law shall be deemed analogous if it criminalizes the operation of a motor vehicle while the operator is impaired by or under the influence of intoxicants or the law criminalizes the operation of a motor vehicle while the operator has a blood alcohol concentration of 0.08 percent or more by weight by volume or 0.08 grams or more per liter of breath as its presumptive or per se level of intoxication.
Title
DUI laws of other states; allows analogous state laws to be used as prior DUI convictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #5 Constitutional Law | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102549D |