VA HB773 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Government Nondiscrimination Act; creation. Creates the Government Nondiscrimination Act (the Act), which prohibits a government entity from taking any discriminatory action against a person on the basis that such person believes, speaks, or acts in accordance with a sincerely held religious belief that marriage is or should be recognized as the union of one man and one woman and that the terms "man" and "woman" refer to an individual's immutable biological sex as objectively determined by anatomy and genetics of the individual at the time of birth. For purposes of the Act, discriminatory actions include actions that adversely affect the tax treatment of a person or that withhold or otherwise make unavailable any (i) grant, contract, subcontract, cooperative agreement, guarantee, loan, scholarship, license, certification, accreditation, or employment; (ii) entitlement or benefit under a benefit program; or (iii) entitlement to utilize state property. The Act also provides that a person shall be considered to be validly accredited, licensed, or certified for any purpose under state law if such person would otherwise have been accredited, licensed, or certified but for a determination based upon such person's sincerely held religious belief or moral conviction.
Title
Government Nondiscrimination Act; created.
Sponsors
Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Les Adams [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. James Edmunds [R] |
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2016-03-11 | House | No further action taken |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Chair ruled bill not properly before the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker ruled Senate substitute 16105751D-S1 not germane |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed by until Monday, March 7, 2016 |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed by until Thursday, March 3, 2016 |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB773S1 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Pending question ordered (34-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105751D-S1 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105751D-S1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 41-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 41-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB773H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Pending question ordered |
2016-02-15 | House | Motion to refer to Courts of Justice committee rejected |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105495D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105495D-H1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102510D |