VA HB775 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia College Savings Plan; stakeholder group to analyze private retirement plans; report. Directs the Virginia College Savings Plan to convene a stakeholder group, analyze private retirement options and develop recommendations, and report to the General Assembly by December 15, 2020. The scope of the study would include (i) an examination of potential retirement savings options for self-employed individuals, part-time employees, and full-time employees whose employers do not offer a retirement savings plan; (ii) the level of interest by Virginia employers in participating in a voluntary state-sponsored private retirement option; (iii) the likely costs to start up such a plan and an estimate of time to reach self-sufficiency and potential funding options; (iv) the experience of other states that have implemented or are implementing a state-sponsored private retirement solution for employers and employees; and (v) the appropriate state agency and structure to implement the solution.
Title
Virginia College Savings Plan; analyzing current programs to encourage citizens to save.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 506 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB775ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108194D-S1 (91-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB775S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108194D-S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108194D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20106638D-EH1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB775EH1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Amendments by Delegate Ayala agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106638D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106638D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104487D |