VA HB79 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Dog boarding establishments; group play requirements; notice; penalties. Requires an employee of a dog boarding establishment to be present at all times that a dog is able to have physical contact with another dog. The bill limits the number of dogs that may have physical contact at any given time based on certain weight classifications. Failure to adequately supervise dogs in group play is established as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also requires notice of risk of group play for dogs to be given to consumers. Failure to provide notice of the risk of group play is established as a Class 3 misdemeanor.
Title
Dog boarding establishments; group play requirements, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-01 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB79H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105704D-H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105704D-H1 |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-12-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100596D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 403.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6518 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6519.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |