VA HB792 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; subtraction for military veterans with a permanent service-connected disability. Establishes for taxable years beginning January 1, 2018, an individual income tax subtraction for the military retirement income of veterans with a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability. The bill provides that the subtraction is available only for taxpayers whose federal adjusted gross income is 150 percent or less of the federal poverty level for a four-person household.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for military veterans with a permanent service-connected disability.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Sen. John Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101487D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB792 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB792+hil |