VA HB792 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appeals of right in general district court; appeals of final orders or judgements entered in the same action or related action. Provides that there shall be an appeal of right to a court of record from any order entered or judgment rendered in a general district court that alters, amends, overturns, or vacates any prior final order. The bill further provides that if any party timely notices such an appeal, such notice of appeal shall be deemed a timely notice of appeal by any other party on a final order or judgment entered in the same or a related action arising from the same conduct, transaction, or occurrence as the underlying action. As introduced, the bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Appeals of right in general district court; appeals of final orders or judgments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 98-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 98-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1048) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1048 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB792ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109463D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Edwards, Petersen, Chafin |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | Delegates: Simon, Bourne, Leftwich |
2020-02-24 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-24 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 98-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108179D-S1 (2-Y 98-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB792S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108179D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108179D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104859D |
Same As/Similar To
SB545 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1049)