VA HB797 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic visitation; state correctional facilities. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Corrections to prescribe reasonable rules regarding electronic visitation systems and the collection of fees for the use of such systems. The bill provides that any facility that uses such a system shall not prohibit in-person visitation.
Title
Electronic visitation; state correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 66 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB797ER) |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 18100572D-E |
2018-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB797E |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100572D |