VA HB806 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
Summary
Reporting of infectious diseases; residential facilities. Adds persons in charge of residential or day programs, services, or facilities licensed by any agency of the Commonwealth to the list of nonphysicians who must report disease outbreaks. This bill is identical to
Title
Infectious diseases; residential or day program, etc. licensed by State to report cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 367 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB806ER) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB806ER) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-20 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-18 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB806H1 | |
2008-01-17 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 088553500-H1 | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-16 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-16 | House: Committee substitute printed 088553500-H1 | |
2008-01-15 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086545500 |
Same As/Similar To
SB463 (Same As) 2010-03-05 - House: Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB806 |