VA HB815 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Method of execution. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Corrections to enter into contracts with a pharmacy or outsourcing facility for the compounding of drugs necessary to carry out an execution by lethal injection and provides that the compounding of such drugs (i) does not constitute the practice of pharmacy; (ii) is not subject to the jurisdiction of the Board of Pharmacy, the Board of Medicine, or the Department of Health Professions; and (iii) is exempt from the laws governing pharmacies and the Drug Control Act (§ 54.1-3400 et seq.). The bill also provides that the identities of any pharmacy or outsourcing facilities that enters into such a contract with the Department of Corrections, any officer or employee of such pharmacy or outsourcing facility, and any person or entity used by such pharmacy or outsourcing facility to facilitate the compounding of such drugs shall be confidential and exempt from the Freedom of Information Act (§ 2.2-3700 et seq.) and shall not be subject to discovery or introduction as evidence in any civil proceeding unless good cause is shown. The bill also sets forth labeling requirements for any drug compounded pursuant to such a contract.
Title
Execution; if lethal injection is not available, electrocution shall be used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: Not Specific and Severable (36-Y 63-N) (Y: 37 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 51-N) (Y: 49 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: Not Specific and Severable (36-Y 63-N) (Y: 37 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 51-N) (Y: 49 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747) | |
2016-04-20 | House | Enacted, Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB815ER2) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 16-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 40-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (59-Y 40-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: Not Specific and Severable (36-Y 63-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | Motion that Governor recommendation is not specific and severable is rejected (36-Y 63-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 51-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (47-Y 51-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-04-08 | House | Governor's substitute printed 16106477D-H1 |
2016-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2016-03-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB815ER) |
2016-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (65-Y 32-N) |
2016-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Obenshain, Saslaw |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Delegates: Miller, Bell, R.B., Watts |
2016-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Dunnavant agreed to |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Surovell rejected |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 5-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 33-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 33-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 7-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101602D |