VA HB830 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; establishment of Farm to School Program Task Force. Requires the Department of Education to establish and appoint such members as it deems necessary or appropriate to the Farm to School Program Task Force for the purpose of increasing student access throughout the Commonwealth to high-quality farm to school programs, defined in the bill as programs (i) whereby public schools purchase and feature prominently in school meals locally produced food or (ii) that involve experiential student learning opportunities relating to local food and agriculture, including school and community garden programs and local farm visits. The bill requires the Task Force to collaborate with local school boards, community-based organizations, farmers, relevant state and local agencies, and other relevant stakeholders to (a) assess existing farm to school programs within the Commonwealth to identify and disseminate to each local school board best practices for implementing and sustaining such programs, (b) establish and distribute to each local school board a guidance document for the establishment and operation of school garden programs, (c) provide information and resources to each local school board to assist it in leveraging grant funds to support farm to school programs, and (d) collect such data and make such policy recommendations to local school boards, the Board of Education, and the General Assembly as it deems appropriate.
Title
Farm to School Program Task Force; Department of Education to establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 97-N) (Y: 3 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 97-N) (Y: 3 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 398 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB830ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 4-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N) |
2024-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Roem, Bagby, Head |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Cousins, McQuinn, Cherry |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 97-N) |
2024-03-05 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 24108253D-S1 (3-Y 97-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB830S1 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108253D-S1 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108253D-S1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB830H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107295D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107295D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Reconsidered by Education |
2024-01-31 | House | Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102113D |
Same As/Similar To
SB314 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)