VA HB837 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Medicare supplement policies for individuals under age 65. Requires insurers offering Medicare supplement policies in the Commonwealth to individuals age 65 or older to offer such policies to individuals who are under 65 years of age and who are eligible for Medicare due to disability.
Title
Medicare; supplement policies for individuals under age 65.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100799D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB837 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB837+hil |