VA HB838 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Summary
Board for Criminal Justice Services; establishment of Executive Committee. Authorizes the Board for Criminal Justice Services to establish an Executive Committee comprising the Chairman and seven members of the Board to take actions on behalf of the Board including hearing an appeal by a regulant of a determination of a violation of the regulations promulgated by the Board. Under the bill, decisions made by the Executive Committee affirming a violation of any regulation promulgated by the Board shall be subject to judicial review in accordance with the Administrative Process Act.
Title
Criminal Justice Services Board; establishment of Executive Committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 305 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB838ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-01 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-29 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086511824 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB838 |