VA HB838 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local correctional facilities; use of state funds for local alternative incarceration programs. Allows the use of state funds appropriated for financial assistance for the confinement of persons in local facilities for local alternative incarceration programs.
Title
Correctional facilities, local; use of state funds for local alternative incarceration programs.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2010-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103726D |