VA HB838 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Lane filtering; motorcycles. Authorizes the operator of a two-wheeled motorcycle to pass another vehicle that is stopped or traveling at no more than 10 miles per hour in the same lane, provided that there are at least two lanes of travel in each direction, such motorcycle does not exceed a speed of 20 miles per hour, and the operator executes such passing safely.
Title
Lane filtering; motorcycles.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Transportation |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102315D |