VA HB839 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
American Revolution 250 Commission; membership and staffing. Amends the membership of the American Revolution 250 Commission to allow for the appointment of ex officio members who are directors of historic homes, historic sites, or National Park Service sites or former legislative members of the Commission. The bill also provides for staff of the Commission to serve as the Commission's fiscal agent.
Title
American Revolution 250 Commission; amends membership and staffing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 400 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB839ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101649D |
Same As/Similar To
SB117 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0401)