VA HB845 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Baylor Survey lines. Authorizes the Marine Resources Commission to reestablish the boundaries of the Baylor Survey between holders of leases on private grounds and the public grounds. Due to recent information that indicates that a number of private leases were granted by the Commission within the Baylor grounds, the Commission, under certain conditions, would be allowed to adjust the lines between private leases that have been held for more than five years and the publicly accessible Baylor grounds.
Title
Baylor Survey; reestablishing lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB845ER) |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102481D-E |
2014-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB845E |
2014-01-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-22 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102481D |