VA HB852 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government ordinances related to fire departments; billing on behalf of volunteer fire departments. Provides that the governing body of any county, city, or town in which a fire department or fire company is established may make such ordinances in relation to the powers and duties of such fire departments or fire companies as it deems proper, including billing on behalf of volunteer fire departments for the support of a licensed emergency medical services agency. Local government ordinances related to fire departments; billing on behalf of volunteer fire departments. Provides that the governing body of any county, city, or town in which a fire department or fire company is established may make such ordinances in relation to the powers and duties of such fire departments or fire companies as it deems proper, including billing on behalf of volunteer fire departments for the support of a licensed emergency medical services agency.
Title
Local government ordinances related to fire departments; billing on behalf of volunteer fire depts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB852ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | BLOCK VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB852ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 24103794D-E |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB852E |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103794D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Fire Protection
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Local Government and Officials
Ordinances
Fire Protection
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Local Government and Officials
Ordinances