VA HB865 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
STEAM Summer Learning Center Fund established. Creates the STEAM Summer Learning Center Fund to award competitive grants to local school divisions in certain regions to train public high school teachers in STEAM education and project-based learning and to provide teachers with skills to conduct workshops to engage public high school students in hands-on, project-based learning in science, technology, engineering, and applied mathematics, including design-build, manufacturing, and modeling and simulation.
Title
STEAM Summer Learning Center Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101128D |