VA HB869 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Urban development areas. Makes incorporation of urban development areas optional rather than mandatory. Currently urban development areas are mandatory for many higher growth localities. The bill also makes technical amendments.
Title
Urban development areas; makes designation optional rather than mandatory for all localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB869ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 6-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (74-Y 24-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101375D |
Same As/Similar To
SB274 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)