VA HB869 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB869
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supplementing compensation of public defender. Requires the governing body of any county or city that elects to supplement the compensation of the attorney for the Commonwealth, or any of their deputies or employees, above the salary of any such officer, deputy, or employee, to supplement the compensation of the public defender, or any of his deputies or employees, in the same amount as the supplement to the compensation of the attorney for the Commonwealth, or any of his deputies or employees.
Title
Public defender or any deputies or employees; proportionally supplementing compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (9-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100539D-E |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB869E |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100539D |
Same As/Similar To
HB869 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (9-Y 5-N)