VA HB870 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permit applications; fingerprints. Removes the option for a locality to require that an applicant for a concealed handgun permit submit fingerprints as part of the application.
Title
Concealed handgun permit; removes option for locality to require applicant to submit fingerprints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (83-Y 15-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102766D |