VA HB885 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of concealed weapons in vehicles. Creates a new exemption to the general prohibition against carrying concealed weapons by allowing a person who may lawfully possess a firearm to carry a handgun in a private motor vehicle or vessel if the handgun is secured in a container or compartment.
Title
Concealed weapons; person may carry a handgun in motor vehicle or vessel if secured in compartment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (71-Y 24-N) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (69-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (71-Y 24-N) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (69-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 841 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB885ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 19-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (71-Y 24-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (71-Y 24-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB885ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-11 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (69-Y 28-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (69-Y 28-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (24-Y 16-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 7-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (74-Y 25-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB885H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104822D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104822D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102254D |