VA HB893 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
E-911 Services Board; Commonwealth Interoperability Coordinator to serve as advisor. Establishes that the Commonwealth Interoperability Coordinator serve as an advisor to the E-911 Services Board to ensure that enhanced wireless emergency telecommunications services and technologies are compliant with the statewide interoperability strategic plan.
Title
E-911 Services Board; Commonwealth Interoperability Coordinator to serve as advisor.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036) | |
2012-02-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 36 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB893ER) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-30 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-24 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101884D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Public Service Companies
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Public Service Companies