VA HB893 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Anatomic pathology services; fees. Prohibits practitioners licensed by the Board of Medicine from charging a fee for anatomic pathology services performed by a person other than the practitioner or a person under the direct supervision of the practitioner that is greater than the fee paid for the delivery of such service.
Title
Anatomic pathology services; fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 81 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB893ER) |
2014-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101549D |