VA HB894 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Auxiliary grants. Expands eligibility for the auxiliary grant program to include individuals who reside in supportive housing licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and directs the Commissioner for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to promulgate regulations for licensure of auxiliary grant service coordination providers for individuals with blindness or physical disabilities and the State Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to promulgate regulations for licensure of auxiliary grant service coordination providers for individuals with mental illness or intellectual disabilities.
Title
Auxiliary grants; expands eligibility for program to certain individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-04 | House | Additional information on Subcommittee substitute available from the chief patron |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Substitute Adopted (Substitute not available) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101579D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 409.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 169.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB894 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB894+hil |