VA HB894 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; exemption. Specifies that a single member limited liability company whose sole member is a nonprofit organization is eligible to be considered for a property exemption by a locality the same as other nonprofit organizations.
Title
Real property tax; exemption for single member limited liability company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0--N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 29 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB894ER) |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0--N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103297D |