VA HB90 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Federal government shutdown; creditor process; utility service. Allows the Governor to declare a state of emergency in response to a federal government shutdown, which is defined as a partial or total discontinuance of federal governmental services due to a failure by the President and Congress to approve the necessary funding for the operations of the federal government. During the period that the state of emergency is in effect, no public utility shall terminate a customer's service for nonpayment if the State Corporation Commission determines that such customer is a federal government employee or contractor or will be disproportionately adversely affected by the federal government shutdown. The bill provides that the Governor, during the state of emergency, may request that the Supreme Court declare a judicial emergency in which all judicial proceedings or other court matters involving creditor process be suspended in cases where the defendant is a federal government employee or contractor or the Supreme Court determines that the defendant will be disproportionately adversely affected by the federal government shutdown.
Title
Federal government; allows Governor to declare state of emergency in response to a shutdown, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100372D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB90 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB90+hil |