VA HB90 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 53-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 53-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Window tinting; vehicles used in the course of business by private investigators, bail bondsmen, and bail enforcement agents. Allows licensed private investigators, licensed bail bondsmen, and licensed bail enforcement agents to apply tinting films to darken certain windows of vehicles used in the course of business to a minimum of 20 percent light transmittance. Current law allows light transmittance minimums of 50 or 35 percent, depending on the window. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Window tinting; vehicles used in the course of business by private investigators and bail bondsmen.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 53-N) (Y: 43 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (43-Y 53-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (43-Y 53-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-12-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100974D |