VA HB917 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Summary
Preservation of papers in court clerk's office. Requires that all papers in the clerk's office be preserved in the office, even if reproduced electronically, and shall be destroyed only in accordance with law. This bill is identical to
Title
Clerk's office; preservation of papers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053) | |
2008-02-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 53 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB917ER) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-07 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB917H1 | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081477572-H1 | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 081477572-H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081708866 |
Same As/Similar To
SB180 (Same As) 2010-01-21 - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB917 |