VA HB918 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act; termination without cause. Provides purchasers of any time-share within the Commonwealth a right to terminate such time-share if, at least 10 years after the initial purchase, the purchaser has paid the entire purchase price of such time-share and does not have any outstanding obligations in regard to the property.
Title
Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act; termination without cause.
Sponsors
Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100766D |