VA HB921 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Members of the National Guard of other states; employment protection. Provides any member of the National Guard of any other state called to perform state active duty or military duty the right to (i) take leave without pay from nongovernmental employment; (ii) retain vacation or other accrued leave; (iii) be restored to the position held prior to active duty or a comparable vacant position upon honorable release; and (iv) not be denied initial employment, reemployment, retention in employment promotion, or any benefit of employment. Current law provides such protections only to members of the National Guard of Virginia and Virginia Defense Force.
Title
National Guard members of other states; employment protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB111-Lingamfelter) by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #3 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101646D |
Same As/Similar To
HB111 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB921 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB921+hil |