VA HB935 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB935
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax refunds for individuals or married persons filing a joint return. Provides an income tax refund of up to $300 for individuals and up to $600 for married persons filing a joint return for taxable year 2021 on or before November 1, 2022. The bill provides that the refund shall not exceed the taxpayer's tax liability. Income tax refunds for individuals or married persons filing a joint return. Provides an income tax refund of up to $300 for individuals and up to $600 for married persons filing a joint return for taxable year 2021 on or before November 1, 2022. The bill provides that the refund shall not exceed the taxpayer's tax liability.
Title
Income tax, state; refund amounts for individuals or married persons filing a joint return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Hanger, Barker, Locke |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Delegates: Robinson, Brewer, Torian |
2022-03-09 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (34-Y 5-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107277D-S1 (0-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB935S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107277D-S1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107277D-S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22100745D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB935E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100745D |
Same As/Similar To
HB935 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455