VA HB939 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Police; guidelines for approval of auxiliary lighting on motorcycles. Directs the Superintendent of State Police to establish guidelines by January 1, 2017, that set forth a procedure for the submission and approval of auxiliary lights for motorcycles. The bill requires any approved lights or equipment to be posted on the Department of State Police website and for the Department of State Police to notify inspection stations of approved lights or equipment.
Title
Motorcycles; auxiliary lighting.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Larry Rush [R] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] |
Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701) | |
2016-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB939ER) |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105947D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB939S1 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105947D-S1 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105947D-S1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported from Transportation (19-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101217D |