VA HB942 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Address Confidentiality Program; real property records. Prohibits the circuit court of any county or city, or the clerk of any such court, or his duly qualified deputy, from disclosing identifying information, including the actual address, contained in real property records of program participants under the Address Confidentiality Program (§2.2-515.2) if the program participant provides notice to the circuit court, unless the program participant consents to such disclosure, a court order directs the disclosure, or there is a bona fide request for a title examination and the circuit court obtains an exemption from the Office of the Attorney General. The bill also requires the clerk of each circuit court of any county or city to establish procedures for recording or filing real property documents in compliance with the Address Confidentiality Program.
Title
Address Confidentiality Program; real property records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102159D |