VA HB944 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forest Sustainability Fund; fund allocation. Provides that moneys from the Forest Sustainability Fund must be allocated proportionally among localities that forgo tax revenues as a result of the use value assessment and taxation for real estate devoted for forest use. The bill specifies that no locality shall receive an allocation of more than four percent or less than one-half of one percent of available funds from the Fund.
Title
Forest Sustainability Fund; fund allocation.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Rozia Henson [D] |
Del. Marty Martinez [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 699 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB944ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101329D |
Same As/Similar To
SB129 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0703)